GA HB713 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-2 and Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions for the Juvenile Code and domestic relations, respectively, so as to provide that causing a child to be conceived as a result of violating certain prohibitions relating to certain offenses is an additional ground for terminating parental rights; to revise definitions; to provide that causing a child to be conceived as a result of violating certain prohibitions relating to certain offenses is an additional ground for losing parental rights and is relevant in certain adoption proceedings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code; domestic relations; terminating parental rights; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2015-12-08 | House | House Prefiled |