GA HB70 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to barbers, so as to provide that a license to operate a barbershop may be granted to mobile barbershops under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Barbers; license to operate mobile barbershops; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Lynmore James [D] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Rep. Willie Talton [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-26 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/32132 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb70_LC_38_1172_a_2.htm |