GA HB689 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Crime Information Center, so as to provide that persons who are victims of an offense of trafficking may petition the clerk of court to have sealed certain criminal history record information maintained by the clerk; to provide that restricted criminal history record information shall be available to criminal justice agencies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Crime Information Center; persons who are victims of an offense of trafficking may petition the clerk of court to have sealed certain criminal history record information; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #664 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House Hopper |