GA HB688 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate and to grant a new charter to the City of Covington, approved January 30, 1962 (Ga. L. 1962, p. 2003), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 18, 1967 (Ga. L. 1967, p. 3157), so as to provide for term limits for the governing authority of such municipality; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Covington, City of; term limits for the governing authority of such municipality; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Act 180 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |