GA HB683 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to provide that certain allocations to owners of certain entities shall be governed by Georgia law; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; certain allocations to owners of certain entities shall be governed by Georgia law; provide
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Vote #530 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-27 | House | House Hopper |