GA HB671 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions for pretrial proceedings; to amend Code Section 24-8-823 of the O.C.G.A., relating to admissions and confessions received with care and no conviction on uncorroborated confession; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to drivers' licenses; to amend Code Section 40-6-391 of the O.C.G.A., relating to driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or other intoxicating substances, penalties, publication of notice of conviction for persons convicted for a second time, and endangering a child while under the influence; to amend Code Section 48-2-35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to taxpayer refunds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pretrial proceedings; admissions and confessions; amend Code; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Nikki Randall [D] |
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House Hopper |