GA HB67 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the sales and use tax exemption regarding eligible food and beverages, so as to provide for a partial suspension of such exemption for a limited period of time; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; food and beverages; suspend exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-03 House Withdrawn, Recommitted
2009-03-05 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-01-15 House Second Readers
2009-01-14 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback