GA HB659 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education accountability assessment programs, so as to provide transparency of financial information of local school systems and schools, to the greatest extent practicable; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for accessibility to certain financial data of a local board of education; to provide for school level budget and expenditure data; to require local school systems and schools to provide certain information on their websites; to provide for certain data and reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; provide transparency of financial information of local school systems and schools; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. JaNice VanNess [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #874 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #812 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #516 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #812 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #516 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Veto V6 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Hopper |