GA HB62 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 33 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the scholarship program for special needs students, so as to provide for additional notification of the program; to provide for application deadlines; to provide deadlines for scholarship payments to parents; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Scholarship program; special needs students; provide additional notification
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Austin [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Alisha Morgan [D] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-25 | House First Readers |