GA HB619 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Pavo; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, powers, and construction; to provide for a governing authority, its qualifications, terms, and related matters; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pavo, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #327 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #327 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 323 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hopper |