GA HB617 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal the amendment to the Constitution of Georgia providing that, upon extension of the corporate limits of the City of Atlanta into Fulton County, the territory embraced therein shall become part of the independent school system of the City of Atlanta and shall cease to be a part of the school system of the county and that the school property located within the area embraced in the extension shall become the property of the City of Atlanta (Res. Act No. 73; H. R. No. 182-969j; Ga. L. 1950, p. 458), which was continued under the 1983 Constitution of the State of Georgia by an Act approved March 26, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 4812); to provide for a referendum with respect to the effectiveness of the foregoing; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlanta, City of; Fulton County; provide for referendum with respect to school system corporate limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51585 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/168918 |