GA HB592 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to COVID-19 pandemic business safety, so as to clarify the gross negligence standard in actions involving COVID-19 liability claims against healthcare facilities, healthcare providers, entities, and individuals; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; gross negligence standard in actions involving COVID-19 liability claims against healthcare facilities, healthcare providers, entities, and individuals; clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Dewey McClain [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59952 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198368 |