GA HB59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-150 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to eligibility for enrollment in elementary and secondary educational programs, so as to allow military students to enroll in a public school based on official military orders prior to physically establishing residency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; military students enroll in public school based on official military orders prior to physically establishing residency; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #362 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #254 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #49 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #254 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #49 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-23 | Act 38 | |
2019-04-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |