GA HB59 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 21 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waiver of sovereign immunity as to actions ex contractu and state tort claims, so as to provide for waiver of sovereign immunity for declaratory judgment or injunctive relief; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State tort claims; waiver of sovereign immunity for declaratory judgment or injunctive relief; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] |
Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #877 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 154 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 154 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Veto V2 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House Hopper |