GA HB586 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in the City of Kingsland; to provide for a short title; to provide for the purposes of such districts; to provide for definitions; to provide for severability; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Kingsland Community Improvement Districts Act of 2013; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 145 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-12 | House | House Hopper |