GA HB561 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state symbols, so as to designate the adoptable dog as the official state dog; to provide legislative findings and declarations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Adoptable dog; official state dog; designate
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #540 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44454 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/150260 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44454#13958 |