GA HB546 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Georgia Pharmacy Practice Act," so as to revise the definition of "pharmacy care"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Pharmacy Practice Act; pharmacy care; revise definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #493 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House Hopper |