GA HB529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Norcross, approved March 28, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4934), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 5, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4727) and by an Act approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4365), so as to change the terms of the mayor and city councilmembers; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Norcross, City of; change terms of mayor and city councilmembers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 291 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |