GA HB525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center, so as to dissolve the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center Authority; to rename the convention center; to create the Savannah-Georgia Convention Center Authority; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for its membership, manner of appointment, terms of office, and powers and duties; to provide for exemption from taxation; to provide for venue; to provide for disposition of property; to exempt its property from levy and sale; to transfer certain assets and liabilities; to repeal certain laws; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center; rename to Savannah Convention Center
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #406 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #289 (Y: 21 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #290 (Y: 22 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #172 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #289 (Y: 21 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #290 (Y: 22 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #172 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 65 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |