GA HB518 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 46-5-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exercise of power of eminent domain by telephone companies, placement of posts and other fixtures, regulation of construction of fixtures, posts, and wires near railroad tracks, liability of telephone companies for damages, required information, and due compensation, so as to specify the accounts or portions thereof considered to be included as part of the term "actual recurring local service revenues"; to provide for a definition; to provide for the due compensation to be paid by telephone companies that do not have certain end user customers; to revise terminology for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Eminent domain; telephone companies; actual recurring local service revenues; specify accounts or portions thereof considered to be included
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Hopper |