GA HB514 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; Fulton County; incorporate
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Virgil Fludd [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Vote #909 (Y: 127 N: 25 NV: 24 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #686 (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #687 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #266 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #219 (Y: 148 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #686 (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #687 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #266 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #219 (Y: 148 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 421 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Postponed |
2015-03-09 | House | House Postponed |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House Hopper |