GA HB486 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 12 and Code Section 24-12-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the practice of professional forestry and disclosure of AIDS confidential information, respectively, so as to conform provisions of the Code due to the passage of 2011 HB 24 and HB 214; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional forestry; disclosure of AIDS confidential information; conform provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #552 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44188 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/149227 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44188#13976 |