GA HB48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House State Properties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state flag, seal, and other symbols, so as to provide for placement of a monument to honor the Original 33; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State flag, seal, and other symbols; monument to honor the Original 33; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-27HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse Hopper
2020-12-16HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback