GA HB478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the central child abuse registry, so as to provide improvements to the operation of the child abuse registry; to provide definitions; to provide for notice of abuse allegations; to provide for reporting abuse cases to DFACS office; to provide for hearing on expungement of name from registry; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; improvements to the operation of the child abuse registry; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #387 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #419 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #356 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #221 (Y: 151 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #419 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #356 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #221 (Y: 151 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 252 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |