GA HB474 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding drivers' licenses, so as to require the Department of Driver Services in any republication of its drivers' manual to include instructions for best practices for facilitating the safety of all parties during a traffic stop by law enforcement; to provide for collaboration; to require the Office of Highway Safety to promote such instructions in certain planned projects or campaigns of a highly visible nature; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Driver Services, Department of; drivers' manual include best practices during traffic stop by law enforcement; require
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #215 (Y: 145 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #215 (Y: 145 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Hopper |