GA HB47 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-80 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to dispensing prescription drugs, so as to authorize certain refills of topical ophthalmic products under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Prescription drugs; certain refills of topical ophthalmic products under certain conditions; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House Vote #27 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House Hopper |