GA HB464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local boards of education, so as to require local boards of education to have a public comment period at every meeting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; local boards of education to have a public comment period at every meeting; require
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Dewayne Hill [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |