GA HB463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the issuance of a Class C driver's license to operators of certain three-wheeled motor vehicles; to exempt operators of certain three-wheeled motor vehicles from headgear and eye-protective device requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance of a Class C driver's license to operators of certain three-wheeled motor vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #792 (Y: 95 N: 55 NV: 17 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #713 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #496 (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #713 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #496 (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 468 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read Tabled |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |