GA HB453 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Dawsonville Airport Authority; to provide for a short title and legislative findings; to confer powers and impose duties on the authority; to provide for the membership and the appointment of members of the authority and their terms of office, qualifications, duties, powers, and compensation; to provide for vacancies, organization, meetings, and expenses; to provide for definitions; to provide for the powers of the authority; to provide for revenue bonds and their form, signatures thereon, negotiability, sale, and use of proceeds from such sales; to provide for interim documents and for lost or mutilated documents; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dawsonville Airport Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #114 - Local Calendar (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 24 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House First Readers |