GA HB449 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 7-1-810, relating to definitions relative to multiple-party accounts, so as to provide a definition of the term "person" to include entities registered to provide preneed services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Multiple-party accounts; definition include preneed service entities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-04 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-03 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/33385 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb449_LC_36_1825_a_2.htm |