GA HB439 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions regarding income taxes, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of income tax credits for business enterprises in less developed areas, employers providing approved retraining, business enterprises having qualified research expenses, base year port traffic, and taxpayers establishing or relocating headquarters into this state; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; credits; business enterprises; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #502 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 157 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #231 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #502 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 157 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #231 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 129 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-16 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Insists | |
2009-04-03 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House First Readers |