GA HB422 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to negotiating railroad crossings and entering highways from private driveways, so as to authorize local governments by ordinance or resolution to authorize the operation of bicycles on sidewalks within the jurisdiction of such local governments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; bicycles on sidewalks; local government; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Robert Teilhet [D] | Rep. Don Wix [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - House - House Vote #123 - Pass (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-04 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House First Readers |