GA HB407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the compensation of the clerk of the superior court, the sheriff, and the judge of the Probate Court of Cobb County from the fee system to the salary system, approved February 9, 1949 (Ga. L. 1949, p. 427), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 28, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3899), so as to change the salary of the clerk of the superior court, the deputy clerk, the executive assistant, and the executive secretary; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Probate Court; change salary of superior court clerk, deputy clerk, executive assistant and executive secretary
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 98 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hopper |