GA HB405 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health care facilities, so as to provide for the regulation and licensing of assisted living communities; to provide for procedures and criteria; to provide for requirements for medication aides; to revise provisions relating to personal care homes; to amend various provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, so as to provide changes for purposes of consistency and conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health care facilities; regulation and licensing of assisted living communities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Tyrone Brooks [D] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers |