GA HB389 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment security, so as to change the definition of employment to include services performed by an individual for wages unless the Department of Labor makes a contrary determination based upon evidence that such individual has been, and will continue to be, free from control or direction over the performance of such services; to provide for civil penalties; to prohibit retaliation by employers against individuals who report violations of or noncompliance with the "Employment Security Law"; to provide for a civil cause of action for retaliation by employers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment security; change definition of employment to include services performed by an individual for wages; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #904 (Y: 155 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #843 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #584 (Y: 162 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-02 Effective Date 2022-07-01
2022-05-02 Act 809
2022-05-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2022-04-04HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2022-04-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-04-04SenateSenate Third Read
2022-04-04SenateSenate Taken from Table
2022-04-01SenateSenate Tabled
2022-03-30SenateSenate Read Second Time
2022-03-30SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2022-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2022-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2022-02-28HouseHouse Postponed
2022-02-24HouseHouse Postponed
2022-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2022-02-01HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2022-01-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback