GA HB373 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to change certain requirements for proof of bona fide conservation use; to provide for payment of attorney's fees and interest in certain situations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property; change certain requirements for proof of bona fide conservation use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #588 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hopper |