GA HB370 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 56 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to risk-based capital levels, so as to require a trend test for property and casualty companies; to revise the definition of a company action level event; to change the definition of negative trend; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Risk-based capital levels; trend test property and casualty companies; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #188 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers |