GA HB367 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedules I, II, III, IV, and V controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of dangerous drug; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; Schedules I, II, III, IV, and V; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #200 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #78 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #78 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 191 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hopper |