GA HB364 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Peachtree City to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peachtree City, City of; levy excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #137 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers |