GA HB351 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenues collected from fines and fees in the probate courts, so as to change the portion of such fines paid to the Judges of the Probate Courts Retirement Fund of Georgia; to provide that a portion of certain fines collected in certain state courts shall be paid to such retirement fund; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate Courts Retirement Fund of Georgia; probate court fines and fees; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Vote #438 - Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Vote #438 - Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 653 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-01-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-01-25 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House First Readers |