GA HB306 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-506 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions and authority to enter into multiyear lease, purchase, or lease purchase contracts, so as to revise the definition of "energy cost savings measures"; to provide that energy cost saving contracts need not be subject to competitive bidding; to amend Chapter 37 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to guaranteed energy savings performance contracting, so as to revise definitions; to revise limitations on improvement that is not causally connected to an energy conservation measure; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; energy cost savings measures; revise definition
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Fleming [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Rick Townsend [R] | Rep. Derrick McCollum [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #94 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hopper |