GA HB300 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of DeKalb County, formerly known as the Civil and Criminal Court of DeKalb County, approved February 14, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2401), as amended, so as to establish the traffic division of said court; to provide for judges; to provide for initial terms and elections; to provide for the assignment of cases; to provide for a solicitor and clerk; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; State Court; establish traffic division of said court; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Vote #36 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Vote #36 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Effective Date | |
2015-03-03 | Act 3 | |
2015-03-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-03-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-02-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hopper |