GA HB288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to clerks of superior courts, so as to revise the sums that the clerks of the superior courts are entitled to charge and collect for filing documents and instruments pertaining to real estate or personal property; to provide for a flat sum structure; to repeal certain related alternative fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior courts; revise the sums that the clerks are entitled to charge and collect for filing documents and instruments pertaining to real estate or personal property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #357 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #173 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-01 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 231
2019-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback