GA HB28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Griffin Judicial Circuit; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for the election of successors to the judge initially appointed; to prescribe the powers of such judges; to prescribe the compensation, salary, and expense allowance of such judges to be paid by the State of Georgia and the counties included in such circuit; to declare inherent authority; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Griffin Judicial Circuit; additional judge of the superior court; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Ken Pullin [R] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Rep. David Stover [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #191 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Vote #19 (Y: 166 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Vote #19 (Y: 166 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 153 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House Hopper |