GA HB271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to shore protection, so as to revise various provisions relative to shore protection; to revise and add definitions; to establish authority and powers of the Department of Natural Resources; to revise provisions relating to permit activities and procedures; to provide for applicability; to strike obsolete language and correct cross-references; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Water resources; shore protection; revise various provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] |
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #665 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |