GA HB250 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 23 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Judicial Retirement System, so as to provide that a member who rejected survivor's benefits may elect such benefits by paying the actuarial cost; to provide for a revised survivor's benefit option for persons who become members on or after July 1, 2012; to provide for options; to provide for the event of death or divorce; to provide for the death of an active member; to provide for the payment of the remainder of a member's accumulated contributions; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Judicial Retirement System; revised survivor's benefit option; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Roger Lane [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #686 - Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Vote #544 - Passage (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Vote #544 - Passage (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 649 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-15 | House First Readers |