GA HB246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-777 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to an annual fitness assessment program, so as to repeal the sunset provision; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; annual fitness assessment program; repeal sunset provision
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #102 (Y: 144 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |