GA HB244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to corporate purposes and powers of electric membership corporations, so as to require electric membership corporations to comply with certain requirements in determining the rates for attachments to utility poles by communications service providers; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Electric membership corporations; comply with certain requirements in determining the rates for attachments to utility poles by communications service providers; require
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #684 (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #628 (Y: 116 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #684 (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #628 (Y: 116 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 592 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House Hopper |