GA HB242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for the regulation of massage therapy educational programs; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to clarify requirements for massage therapy licenses; to provide for violations; to provide for conditions relating to regulation by counties, municipalities, or other local jurisdictions relating to massage therapy; to require reporting of violations of Chapter 24A; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Massage Therapy Practice Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #373 (Y: 144 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #117 (Y: 156 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #117 (Y: 156 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 213 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-12 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House Hopper |