GA HB234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 9, 15, 16, 17, and 41 of the O.C.G.A., relating to civil practice, courts, crimes and offenses, criminal procedure, and nuisances, respectively, so as to provide additional safeguards and protections against human trafficking; to authorize DFCS to provide care and supervision to children who are victims of human trafficking; to expand prohibitions against trafficking of persons for labor or sexual servitude; to revise the definition of prostitution; to increase the penalties for certain sexual offenses; to repeal the crime of pandering by compulsion; to provide that the use of certain property in connection with human trafficking constitutes a nuisance and to provide for what constitutes notice of such use; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Anti-Human Trafficking Protective Response Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #107 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |